THE ST JAMES THE LESS PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1103639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £38.90k £33.58k £36.49k £34.99k £43.81k
Total expenditure £40.39k £34.74k £38.50k £37.74k £39.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A