Financial history LLANFAIR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1102667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £9.99k £6.44k £3.27k £3.46k £1.31k
Total expenditure £7.25k £4.06k £5.24k £5.06k £964
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A