Financial history CHRIST CHURCH CENTRAL

Charity number: 1102856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £309.19k £347.43k £288.16k £440.57k £173.99k
Total expenditure £209.77k £217.57k £245.58k £231.55k £173.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A