ST PETER'S PRIMARY SCHOOL, EDGMOND PTA

Charity number: 1102984
Charity reporting is overdue by 889 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £2.43k £3.41k £4.58k £4.85k £7.26k
Total expenditure £1.75k £2.05k £3.98k £3.51k £9.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A