REFORM RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1103739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 December 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 November 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time Download