REFORM RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1103739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.44m £912.92k £812.13k £808.29k £511.07k
Total expenditure £1.00m £1.06m £1.07m £1.07m £787.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £41.07k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £844.44k £894.19k £749.29k £742.17k £451.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £66.10k £59.44k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £62.84k £11 £0
Income - Other £594.99k £18.72k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £876.76k £913.62k £933.59k £921.76k £711.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.76k £126.22k £138.49k £142.36k £65.19k
Expenditure - Governance £13.03k £16.10k £9.23k £10.02k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £13.03k £16.10k £0 £10.02k £10.52k