Financial history AVERY HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £237.82k £229.61k £282.37k £345.76k £492.05k
Total expenditure £186.46k £229.37k £310.28k £307.51k £352.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k N/A £10.00k