FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND (V.A.) PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1105198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 October 2021 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 July 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required