FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND (V.A.) PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1105198
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £6.59k £5.06k £4.77k £5.05k £2.79k
Total expenditure £6.28k £5.89k £3.60k £3.73k £6.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A