BARKSTON ASH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1103706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.14k £10.99k £9.85k £12.52k £8.62k
Total expenditure £8.49k £9.44k £7.48k £8.09k £10.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A