Financial history THE GALANTHUS TRUST

Charity number: 1103538
Charity reporting is overdue by 300 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £1.28k £974 £1.34k £1.21k £140.42k
Total expenditure £55.00k £36.00k £1.00k £28.95k £22.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A