FRIENDS OF FOLKESTONE ACADEMY LTD

Charity number: 1103352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £162.00k £178.00k £188.00k £204.00k £196.00k
Total expenditure £118.00k £78.00k £90.00k £95.00k £159.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A