UBUNTU PATHWAYS

Charity number: 1103749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM HENRY VOGE Trustee 05 January 2012 None on record
Louise Celeste Bennetts Trustee 13 November 2019 None on record
JACOB LIEF Trustee None on record
Colin Andrew Wilkie Cowie Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
PAULO EAPEN Trustee 17 January 2013 None on record
MALIZOLE GWAXULA Trustee None on record
NICOLA DRAGO Trustee 15 November 2017 None on record
DANIEL OSORIO Chair None on record
DEBORAH SHAINFELD Trustee 04 June 2014 None on record
SCOTT SHLEIFER Trustee 16 November 2011 None on record
ANDREW ROLFE Trustee None on record
ZIYANDA NOZIPHO NTSHONA Trustee 05 January 2012 None on record
RUSH MCCLOY Trustee None on record
STEPHANIE GOLDMAN Trustee 17 July 2013 None on record
Anne Fass Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
KIM HOWARD Trustee 03 September 2012 None on record
Dr FRANK LIPMAN Trustee None on record