Financial history THE ST MARY'S BARNARD CASTLE PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.63k £10.52k £18.64k £8.71k £11.17k
Total expenditure £12.91k £12.69k £13.91k £14.08k £10.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.14k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.04k