Financial history ST MARGARET'S CEVAP SCHOOL PTA (IPSWICH)

Charity number: 1103840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.43k £17.58k £16.58k £15.44k £2.38k
Total expenditure £26.26k £6.75k £16.73k £12.70k £6.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A