KIND AID INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1105781
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £262.33k £154.07k £145.42k £74.04k £90.62k
Total expenditure £272.85k £174.02k £120.13k £123.01k £113.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A