Financial history THE HOPE CENTRE ST HELENS

Charity number: 1103903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £262.52k £168.20k £239.46k £188.58k £391.23k
Total expenditure £270.39k £209.16k £194.92k £220.20k £238.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £39.78k £33.78k £47.87k £65.00k