HYPERMOBILITY UK

Charity number: 1105223
Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 121 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 121 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required