HYPERMOBILITY UK

Charity number: 1105223
Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £10.00k £12 £300 £0 £10.00k
Total expenditure £9.92k £5 £299 £0 £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A