Financial history FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF BARFORD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.34k £20.55k £17.99k £7.28k £7.15k
Total expenditure £15.44k £16.10k £16.16k £13.03k £5.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A