ST. MARY MAGDALEN'S CATHOLIC SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1104295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 January 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required