ST. MARY MAGDALEN'S CATHOLIC SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1104295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £7.70k £9.34k £9.97k £8.63k £5.23k
Total expenditure £6.75k £7.78k £10.93k £8.39k £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A