SOLACE SURVIVING EXILE AND PERSECUTION

Charity number: 1104507
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary Craig Trustee 12 June 2018
COMMUNITY FIRST YORKSHIRE LTD Received: On time
Dr Victoria Betton Trustee 17 March 2017 None on record
Carol Reid Trustee 02 June 2020 None on record
CATHERINE GRACE FOLLIN Trustee 02 June 2020
TRUST LEEDS Received: On time
MEANWOOD VALLEY URBAN FARM LIMITED Received: On time
Christopher Mark Foren Trustee 29 November 2016 None on record
Jo Habib Trustee 05 December 2017 None on record
ian fairley Trustee 12 June 2018 None on record
Pascale Gayford Trustee 08 December 2015 None on record