COMMUNITIES WELFARE NETWORK

Charity number: 1104662
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £43.64k £59.04k £40.43k £83.20k £59.22k
Total expenditure £40.98k £56.74k £36.61k £73.67k £55.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0