Financial history TIGER MOUNTAIN THARU FUND

Charity number: 1105656
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £100 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A