HOLLINWOOD CANAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1104942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.36k £1.20k £1.25k £1.01k £1.25k
Total expenditure £521 £649 £792 £1.02k £953
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A