FAITHWORKS WESSEX

Charity number: 1108714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £361.34k £404.39k £394.19k £464.86k £738.41k
Total expenditure £365.47k £394.78k £413.42k £426.84k £535.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £48.27k
Income from government grants £0 £2.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £669.67k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.38k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £64.41k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £949
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £526.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.23k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0