Trustees FAITHWORKS WESSEX

Charity number: 1108714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Ann Ferguson Chair 01 June 2020
None on record
Liz Davies Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Rev Christopher Beaumont Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Richard Andrew Stamp Trustee 01 June 2020
GATEWAY CHURCH, POOLE
Received: On time
Rev Sarah Elizabeth Yetman Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
NEIL STEVENS Trustee 06 July 2017
None on record
CLIFFORD IAN JAMES Trustee 18 January 2012
None on record
BENJAMIN RICHARD GRIFFITHS Trustee
BULGARIAN SUPPORT FUND
Overdue by 48 days
THE GREENHILL FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Received: On time