FRIENDS OF ST. LAWRENCE NEWLANDS CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1105166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 04 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required