FRIENDS OF ST. LAWRENCE NEWLANDS CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1105166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £13.05k £3.03k £2.10k £6.20k £8.53k
Total expenditure £168.49k £1.05k £4.01k £4.55k £1.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A