THE COLLEGE OR HALL OF VALENCE MARY COMMONLY PEMBROKE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £49.17m £15.93m £17.36m £17.68m £17.59m
Total expenditure £14.78m £15.19m £16.30m £20.58m £17.39m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £38.45m £5.05m £5.06m £3.89m £4.15m
Income - Other trading activities £293.00k £294.00k £346.00k £424.00k £260.00k
Income - Charitable activities £8.78m £8.88m £9.76m £10.60m £10.47m
Income - Endowments £189.85k £1.43m £1.11m £87.15k £66.25k
Income - Investment £1.38m £1.62m £2.11m £2.60m £2.29m
Income - Other £271.00k £78.00k £78.00k £156.00k £417.00k
Income - Legacies £1.21m £268.40k £354.52k £4.90k £1.32m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.50m £13.64m £14.80m £17.99m £14.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.26m £1.51m £1.17m £729.00k £757.00k
Expenditure - Governance £571.00k £672.00k £708.18k £689.44k £660.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £459.00k £547.00k £569.00k £398.00k £504.00k
Expenditure - Other £18.00k £50.00k £334.00k £1.87m £2.47m