CHRISTIAN AID

Charity number: 1105851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £106.98m £97.03m £117.92m £120.40m £106.00m
Total expenditure £100.44m £93.63m £111.07m £122.30m £113.60m
Income from government contracts £9.51m £5.30m £4.09m £7.27m £5.90m
Income from government grants £25.04m £25.56m £7.49m £1.02m £3.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £97.13m £91.52m £112.67m £111.70m £99.20m
Income - Other trading activities £237.00k £87.00k £665.00k £900.00k £800.00k
Income - Charitable activities £9.51m £5.30m £4.50m £7.70m £5.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.00k £72.00k £75.00k £100.00k £100.00k
Income - Other £13.00k £60.00k £7.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £12.82m £9.79m £12.05m £13.50m £10.70m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £85.28m £80.52m £95.80m £107.30m £99.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.17m £13.11m £15.27m £15.00m £14.60m
Expenditure - Governance £883.00k £788.00k £250.00k £393.00k £500.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £42.97m £39.02m £39.77m £45.70m £45.10m
Expenditure - Investment management £25.00k £23.00k £23.00k £25.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0