ST ANTONY'S COLLEGE KAYTS ALUMNI ASSOCIATION OF EUROPE (SACKAAEU)

Charity number: 1106466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.61k £4.57k £0 £3.83k £6.05k
Total expenditure £7.38k £5.02k £182 £3.19k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A