REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ("RCCG") FOUNTAIN OF GRACE

Charity number: 1105604
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2020 22 August 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 22 August 2021 82 days late Download
Annual return 01 August 2019 19 July 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 19 July 2020 48 days late Download
Annual return 01 August 2018 28 September 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2018 28 September 2019 119 days late Download
Annual return 01 August 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 August 2016 29 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2016 29 May 2017 On time Download