REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ("RCCG") FOUNTAIN OF GRACE

Charity number: 1105604
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/08/2016 01/08/2017 01/08/2018 01/08/2019 01/08/2020
Total gross income £112.26k £113.95k £109.42k £106.26k £102.47k
Total expenditure £103.42k £111.03k £98.16k £93.59k £92.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A