WHEATLEY HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1105615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £186.86k £196.26k £177.87k £254.47k £200.95k
Total expenditure £191.49k £173.71k £180.38k £201.08k £236.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.37k £24.60k £0 £6.32k N/A