SMILE MALAWI

Charity number: 1106225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time Download