SMILE MALAWI

Charity number: 1106225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £68.02k £77.07k £112.26k £97.69k £90.96k
Total expenditure £66.87k £75.57k £118.59k £88.57k £89.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A