THE WESTIE RESCUE SCHEME LIMITED

Charity number: 1107970
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £51.39k £153.27k £79.54k £138.63k £154.39k
Total expenditure £43.47k £115.38k £76.59k £44.40k £36.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A