Financial history NATIONAL ALLOTMENT GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1108147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.02k £2.67k £1.40k £1.41k £850
Total expenditure £2.27k £12.62k £6.80k £14.24k £4.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A