Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MABYN CHURCH

Charity number: 1105840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £1.54k £1.63k £2.30k £1.03k £853
Total expenditure £1.63k £6.02k £638 £15 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A