Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CE PRIMARYSCHOOL DILWYN

Charity number: 1105882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £2.46k £1.40k £1.73k £2.55k £1.94k
Total expenditure £1.89k £2.98k £1.43k £109 £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A