YEW TREE FARM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106214
Charity reporting is overdue by 1812 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 717 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 717 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1082 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1082 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1447 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1447 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1812 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1812 days