EMAN FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1106916
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £109.15k £45.16k £78.24k £136.62k £136.62k
Total expenditure £96.65k £50.38k £45.47k £67.05k £67.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A