DARTMOOR SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM (PLYMOUTH)

Charity number: 1106095
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time Download