DARTMOOR SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM (PLYMOUTH)

Charity number: 1106095
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £128.60k £65.59k £51.75k £30.51k £92.49k
Total expenditure £172.53k £37.87k £49.40k £36.63k £54.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £7.03k £7.03k