Financial history THE DOROTHY HELEN HABBEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1108185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/02/2018 18/02/2019 18/02/2020 18/02/2021 18/02/2022
Total gross income £18.78k £19.55k £16.97k £16.58k £7.92k
Total expenditure £20.20k £19.18k £19.01k £27.02k £13.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A