YMCA BATH GROUP

Charity number: 1106370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.11m £3.93m £3.54m £3.73m £4.71m
Total expenditure £3.04m £2.96m £3.90m £3.85m £4.90m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £258.23k £1.00m £372.84k £96.88k £170.09k
Income - Other trading activities £1.10m £913.31k £898.51k £1.22m £1.34m
Income - Charitable activities £1.72m £1.97m £2.24m £2.38m £3.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.53k £28.78k £23.09k £24.29k £30.16k
Income - Other £2.24k £14.38k £3.52k £8.31k £10.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.08m £2.13m £3.90m £2.74m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £822.39k £0 £1.10m £1.21m
Expenditure - Governance £21.48k £19.77k £39.16k £40.35k £42.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £172.64k £8.56k £0 £7.48k £8.55k