THE KENNETH AND BARBARA BOARDMAN-WESTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1107032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time Download