THE KENNETH AND BARBARA BOARDMAN-WESTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1107032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £44.93k £47.38k £63.02k £59.21k £45.37k
Total expenditure £38.38k £45.56k £48.59k £48.43k £49.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A